ME LD1782 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Contributing to Candidates and Political Action Committees
Title
An Act Regarding Contributing to Candidates and Political Action Committees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2022-04-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-04-05 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-04-05 | House | On motion of Representative CAIAZZO of Scarborough, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED |
2022-03-31 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-03-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator BENNETT of Oxford Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Report |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Subsequently On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec Moved The Majority Ought to Pass Report Roll Call Ordered |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-03-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass Report . |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass Report . |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Reports READ and ACCEPTED |
2022-02-23 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP/ONTP |
2022-01-19 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-01-19 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-12-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 7, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |