ME LD1780 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow Unorganized Territory School Staff To Receive Annualized Pay
Title
An Act To Allow Unorganized Territory School Staff To Receive Annualized Pay
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-29 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-817) in concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-817) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-03-24 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-03-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-03-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-22 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-817). |
2022-03-22 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-03-22 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-817) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-03-22 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-03-22 | House | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-22 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-03-21 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-02-24 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-02-24 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-01-19 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-11-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-11-30 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on November 30, 2021. |