ME LD1778 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 636 Yeas 18 - Nays 13 - Excused 3 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 636 Yeas 18 - Nays 13 - Excused 3 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Health Care Affordability and Increase Options for Comprehensive Coverage for Individuals and Small Businesses in Maine
Title
An Act To Improve Health Care Affordability and Increase Options for Comprehensive Coverage for Individuals and Small Businesses in Maine
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Evans [D] | Rep. Poppy Arford [D] | Rep. Heidi Brooks [D] | Rep. Benjamin Collings [D] |
Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Rep. Kristi Mathieson [D] | Rep. Gina Melaragno [D] | Rep. Denise Tepler [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Enactment RC #636 (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #458 (Y: 77 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #458 (Y: 77 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 636 Yeas 18 - Nays 13 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-22 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-773) in concurrence |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-773) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-03-09 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-03-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator SANBORN of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-02-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-02-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-773). |
2022-02-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-02-23 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-773) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-02-23 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-02-23 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 458 (Yeas 77 - Nays 58 - Absent 13 - Excused 0) |
2022-02-23 | House | On motion of Representative TEPLER of Topsham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-02-23 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-02-18 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-01-20 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-01-20 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-11-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-11-30 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on November 30, 2021. |