ME LD1773 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Improve Dental Insurance Coverage for Maine Children
Title
An Act To Improve Dental Insurance Coverage for Maine Children
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Alfond [D] | Rep. Henry Beck [D] | Sen. Peter Bowman [D] | Rep. Alexander du Houx [D] |
Rep. Adam Goode [D] | Rep. Edward Legg [D] | Sen. Earle Mccormick [R] | Rep. Terry Morrison [D] |
Rep. Sharon Treat [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2010-03-26 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-26 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 314 (Yeas 140 - Nays 0 - Absent 11 - Excused 0) | |
2010-03-26 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-431) | |
2010-03-24 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2010-03-23 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2010-03-22 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2010-03-22 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-431) | |
2010-03-22 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2010-03-18 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2010-03-18 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-431) READ and ADOPTED | |
2010-03-18 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2010-03-18 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED | |
2010-02-04 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-02-04 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) Sent down for concurrence | |
2010-02-04 | (S) On motion by Senator Bowman of York REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES | |
2010-02-04 | (S) Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed |