ME LD1766 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-26 - (S) FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-26 - (S) FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 61: Rules for Major Capital School Construction Projects, a Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Education and the State Board of Education
Title
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 61: Rules for Major Capital School Construction Projects, a Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Education and the State Board of Education
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | (S) FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required , in concurrence. | |
2012-03-26 | (S) TAKEN from the Table by the President. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-03-23 | (S) On motion by Senator ALFOND of Cumberland TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-22 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-22 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2012-03-21 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-21 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-21 | (S) On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock, the Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. | |
2012-03-21 | (S) Reports READ. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) The Resolve was READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) On motion of Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2012-01-11 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence On motion by Senator Langley of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218 in concurrence | |
2012-01-10 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-01-10 | (H) The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. | |
2012-01-10 | (H) Report was READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2012-01-10 | (H) Representative RICHARDSON for the Department of Education and the State Board of Education pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072, reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |