ME LD1763 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Authorize Certain Health Care Professionals Who Are Not Physicians To Perform Abortions
Title
An Act To Authorize Certain Health Care Professionals Who Are Not Physicians To Perform Abortions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | House | The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2018-07-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-06-26 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-06-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-06-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-05-02 | House | Carried over to any special session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-04-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-17 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-10 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-29 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-27 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-22 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-01 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-27 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-22 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-01 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-01-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-01-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-01-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-01-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-01-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-01-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-01-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-01-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-01-03 | House | Later today assigned. |
2018-01-03 | House | On motion of Representative FREDETTE of Newport, TABLED pending REFERENCE. |
2018-01-03 | House | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1763&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1217&item=1&snum=128 |