ME LD1753 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Retirement of Law Enforcement Officers under the Participating Local District Retirement Program
Title
An Act Regarding the Retirement of Law Enforcement Officers under the Participating Local District Retirement Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2022-02-10 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2022-02-07 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2022-02-07 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-01-31 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on November 30, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1753&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0613&item=1&snum=130 |