ME LD1753 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-04 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-04 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Adjust the Milk Handling Fee
Title
An Act To Adjust the Milk Handling Fee
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-04 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence | |
2010-02-04 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2010-02-02 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2010-01-28 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2010-01-28 | (S) On motion by Senator BARTLETT of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT (Emergency -2/3 Elected Required) in concurrence | |
2010-01-26 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-01-26 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Sent forthwith to the Engrossing Division. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |