ME LD1738 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Create Lodging for Legislators
Title
An Act to Create Lodging for Legislators
Sponsors
Rep. Benjamin Collings [D] | Rep. Nathan Carlow [R] | Rep. William Faulkingham [R] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] |
Rep. Joseph Perry [D] | Rep. Maureen Terry [D] | Rep. Austin Theriault [R] | Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-05-30 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2023-05-19 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-05-19 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-20 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence |
2023-04-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-20 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2023-04-20 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1738&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1117&item=1&snum=131 |