ME LD171 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Establish a Pilot Project To Evaluate and Address the Transportation Needs of Maine's Veterans
Title
Resolve, To Establish a Pilot Project To Evaluate and Address the Transportation Needs of Maine's Veterans
Sponsors
Rep. Bettyann Sheats [D] | Rep. Betty Austin [D] | Rep. Bruce Bickford [R] | Sen. Everett Carson [D] |
Sen. Ned Claxton [D] | Sen. Bradlee Farrin [R] | Sen. Nathan Libby [D] | Rep. John Schneck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2019-04-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-30 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-116), in concurrence. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-116) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-23 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-116). |
2019-04-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-04-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator Diamond of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2019-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-05 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS |
2019-03-05 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-03-05 | House | Representative McLEAN from the Committee on TRANSPORTATION Reporting that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence |
2019-01-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-17 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |