ME LD1709 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Limited-entry Program for Taking Lobsters in the Monhegan Lobster Conservation Area
Title
An Act To Amend the Limited-entry Program for Taking Lobsters in the Monhegan Lobster Conservation Area
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-02-29 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-02-29 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-02-28 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith. | |
2012-02-28 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. | |
2012-02-28 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2012-02-23 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2012-02-23 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-02-23 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-02-22 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-02-22 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED | |
2012-02-22 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2012-02-22 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2012-02-21 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-12-23 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. | |
2011-12-23 | (H) Received by the Clerk of the House on December 21, 2011. |