ME LD1708 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Vetoed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create the Pine Tree Power Company, a Nonprofit Utility, To Deliver Lower Rates, Reliability and Local Control for Maine Energy Independence
Title
An Act To Create the Pine Tree Power Company, a Nonprofit Utility, To Deliver Lower Rates, Reliability and Local Control for Maine Energy Independence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-19 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #427 (Y: 68 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Enactment RC #472 (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #464 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - Adopt Hbh-738 To Cah-640 RC #388 (Y: 77 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Enactment RC #438 (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #388 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Passage To Be Engrossed RC #303 (Y: 76 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #302 (Y: 76 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Enactment RC #472 (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #464 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - Adopt Hbh-738 To Cah-640 RC #388 (Y: 77 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Enactment RC #438 (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #388 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Passage To Be Engrossed RC #303 (Y: 76 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #302 (Y: 76 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-19 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-07-19 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-07-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 427V 68 having voted in the affirmative and 65 in the negative, with 17 being absent, and 0 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2021-07-19 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 472 Yeas 18 - Nays 14 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-30 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 464 Yeas 18 - Nays 15 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-640) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-738) thereto in concurrence |
2021-06-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland The Senate RECONSIDERED the RECEDE and CONCUR motion |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc moved to RECEDE and CONCUR |
2021-06-30 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-30 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2021-06-30 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-640) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-738) thereto. |
2021-06-30 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-640) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-738) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2021-06-30 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 388 (Yeas 77 - Nays 68 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-30 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, House Amendment "B" (H-738) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-640) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-30 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the House RECEDED. |
2021-06-30 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2021-06-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-18 | Senate | RELEASED. |
2021-06-18 | Senate | HELD at the Request of Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin. |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 438 Yeas 17 - Nays 18 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-18 | Senate | FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2021-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator POULIOT of Kennebec Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-18 | House | Later today assigned. |
2021-06-18 | House | On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-640) in concurrence |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-640) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 388 Yeas 19 - Nays 16 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 303 (Yeas 76 - Nays 62 - Absent 13 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-15 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-640). |
2021-06-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-15 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-640) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-15 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 302 (Yeas 76 - Nays 64 - Absent 11 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-15 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-06-15 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-01 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-06-01 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-13 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-05-13 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on May 13, 2021. |