ME LD1693 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Law Governing Abatements of Property Taxes for Infirmity or Poverty and the Administration of the Circuitbreaker Program
Title
An Act To Amend the Law Governing Abatements of Property Taxes for Infirmity or Poverty and the Administration of the Circuitbreaker Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-03-15 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith. | |
2012-03-15 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-754), in concurrence. | |
2012-03-15 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2012-03-14 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2012-03-14 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-754) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-14 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-14 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-754) | |
2012-03-13 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) Under suspension of the rules | |
2012-03-13 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-12-23 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. | |
2011-12-23 | (H) Received by the Clerk of the House on December 21, 2011. |