ME LD1691 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Secretary of State To Study the Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts
Title
Resolve, Directing the Secretary of State To Study the Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Moonen [D] | Sen. Everett Carson [D] | Sen. James Dill [D] | Rep. Bruce Bickford [R] |
Rep. Thomas Longstaff [D] | Rep. Anne Perry [D] | Rep. John Picchiotti [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #509 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #479 (Y: 79 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #479 (Y: 79 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of the Minority OUGHT NOT TO PASS Report In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-02-13 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-13 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 509 Yeas 18 - Nays 16 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Subsequently On motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Reports READ |
2018-02-01 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-01 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2018-02-01 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2018-02-01 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 479 (Yeas 79 - Nays 66 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2018-02-01 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2018-02-01 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-02-01 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-12-22 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2017-12-22 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 19, 2017. |