ME LD1686 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - Ordered Sent Forthwith.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - Ordered Sent Forthwith.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Finance Authority of Maine Act
Title
An Act To Amend the Finance Authority of Maine Act
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Volk [R] | Sen. Erin Herbig [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-29 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #677 (Y: 122 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #703 (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #703 (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | House | Ordered Sent Forthwith. |
2016-04-29 | House | Sent to the Engrossing Department. |
2016-04-29 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 677V 122 having voted in the affirmative and 24 in the negative, with 5 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2016-04-29 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-04-29 | Senate | LD 1686 In Senate, April 29, 2016, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 28 In Favor and 7 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2016-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-04-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-463). |
2016-04-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2016-04-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2016-04-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-463) . |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-463) READ and ADOPTED. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2016-03-30 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-30 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator Volk of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |
2016-03-30 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |