ME LD1679 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-11 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-11 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase the Salary of the Governor and the Salary of Legislators upon Reduction in the Size of the Legislature
Title
An Act To Increase the Salary of the Governor and the Salary of Legislators upon Reduction in the Size of the Legislature
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2016-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2016-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-07 | House | On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2016-04-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator Whittemore of Somerset, REFERRED to the Committee on State and Local Government, in concurrence. |
2016-03-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-29 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2016-03-29 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1679&snum=127 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1149&item=1&snum=127 |