ME LD1677 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Allow Reentry Houses as Part of Supervised Community Confinement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Allow Reentry Houses as Part of Supervised Community Confinement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18SenateSubsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
2019-06-18SenateOn Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2019-06-14SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-13HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-13HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-12SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2019-06-12SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-562), in concurrence.
2019-06-12SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-562) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-12SenateREAD ONCE.
2019-06-12SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-12HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-12HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-562).
2019-06-12HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-06-12HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-05-07SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence
2019-05-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-02HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
2019-05-02HouseCommittee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback