ME LD1673 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish Fair Housing Goals in Certain Communities in Maine
Title
An Act To Establish Fair Housing Goals in Certain Communities in Maine
Sponsors
Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] | Sen. Joseph Baldacci [D] | Rep. Scott Cuddy [D] | Rep. Traci Gere [D] |
Sen. David Miramant [D] | Rep. Victoria Morales [D] | Rep. Laura Supica [D] | Rep. Michael Sylvester [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #722 (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #527 (Y: 78 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #527 (Y: 78 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-25 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-939) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-622) thereto. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-939) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-622) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-939) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-622) thereto ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-622) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-939) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-939) was ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-939) |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-11 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-939) in concurrence |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-939) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-11 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 722 Yeas 16 - Nays 13 - Excused 5 - Absent 0 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-939). |
2022-04-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-04-07 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-939) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-07 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-04-07 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 527 (Yeas 78 - Nays 58 - Absent 11 - Excused 0 - Vacant 4) |
2022-04-07 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-04-06 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-03-18 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-03-18 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-07-19 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302. |
2021-06-21 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-05-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-05-03 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on May 3, 2021. |