ME LD1668 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Develop a Plan To Close the Long Creek Youth Development Center and Redirect Funding to Community Integration Services for Adjudicated Youth
Title
Resolve, To Develop a Plan To Close the Long Creek Youth Development Center and Redirect Funding to Community Integration Services for Adjudicated Youth
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #397 (Y: 73 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'b' Ontp RC #328 (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-10 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp RC #227 (Y: 81 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'b' Ontp RC #328 (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-10 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp RC #227 (Y: 81 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-30 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-06-30 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 397V 73 having voted in the affirmative and 72 in the negative, with 6 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Resolve not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2021-06-30 | House | This Resolve, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Resolve become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2021-06-15 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence |
2021-06-14 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Subsequently The Report A Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 328 Yeas 15 - Nays 19 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York Report B Ought Not To Pass FAILED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-10 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-06-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-10 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-10 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 227 (Yeas 81 - Nays 57 - Absent 13 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-10 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, REPORT A Ought to Pass was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-10 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2021-06-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-07 | House | Later today assigned. |
2021-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2021-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP/ONTP |
2021-05-18 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-18 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-03 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-05-03 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on May 3, 2021. |