ME LD1651 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Exempt Certain Natural Gas Consumers from an Assessment and To Extend a Moratorium on Assessments for Other Large-volume Consumers of Natural Gas
Title
An Act To Exempt Certain Natural Gas Consumers from an Assessment and To Extend a Moratorium on Assessments for Other Large-volume Consumers of Natural Gas
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ TWICE and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence |
2016-03-16 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-15 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2016-03-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2016-03-15 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2016-03-15 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2016-03-15 | House | Reported by Representative DION for the Joint Standing Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology pursuant to Resolve 2015, chapter 39, section 2. |