ME LD1645 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Reduce Plastic Packaging Waste
Title
An Act to Reduce Plastic Packaging Waste
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-13 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #292 (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-06-12 - House - Insist RC #163 (Y: 77 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Accept Minority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #241 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - House - Insist RC #163 (Y: 77 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Accept Minority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #241 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-13 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Subsequently The Senate INSISTED To The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 292 Yeas 13 - Nays 18 - Excused 4 - Absent 0 FAILED |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senator BENNETT of Oxford moved to RECEDE and CONCUR |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc moved The Senate INSIST To Accept The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report |
2023-06-12 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-12 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 163 (Yeas 77 - Nays 61 - Absent 12 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2023-06-12 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-360). |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 241 Yeas 22 - Nays 12 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2023-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRENNER of Cumberland the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Reports Read |
2023-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-360). |
2023-06-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2023-06-07 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-360) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-06-07 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2023-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative GRAMLICH of Old Orchard Beach, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2023-05-18 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-18 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-13 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence |
2023-04-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2023-04-12 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |