ME LD1644 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Establishing the Commission To Study Ways To Support and Strengthen the Direct Care Workforce across the Long-term Care Continuum
Title
Resolve, Establishing the Commission To Study Ways To Support and Strengthen the Direct Care Workforce across the Long-term Care Continuum
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - House - Final Passage - Emer RC #544 (Y: 86 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2016-04-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE in concurrence |
2016-04-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-04 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2016-04-01 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-01 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-606) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-455). |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-606) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-455) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-04-01 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-455) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-04-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator HASKELL of Cumberland The Senate RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-606) |
2016-03-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-31 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 544 (Yeas 86 - Nays 62 - Absent 3 - Excused 0) |
2016-03-31 | House | FAILED FINAL PASSAGE. |
2016-03-31 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2016-03-31 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2016-03-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-30 | House | Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2016-03-30 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, TABLED pending FINAL PASSAGE. |
2016-03-30 | House | Subsequenty, the same Representative WITHDREW his request for a RULING. |
2016-03-30 | House | Representative FREDETTE of Newport ASKED the Chair to RULE if a roll call was in order. |
2016-03-30 | House | More than one-fifth of the members present expressed a desire for a roll call, which was ordered. |
2016-03-30 | House | Representative McCABE of Skowhegan REQUESTED a Roll Call on FINAL PASSAGE. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-606), in concurrence. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-606) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Reports READ |
2016-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-28 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-606). |
2016-03-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2016-03-28 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-606) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2016-03-28 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2016-03-28 | House | On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2016-03-28 | House | Reports READ. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on Health and Human Services, in concurrence. |
2016-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-10 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2016-03-10 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |