ME LD1642 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act Relating to Road Noise
Title
An Act Relating to Road Noise
Sponsors
Rep. Joan Cohen [D] | Sen. Gerald Davis [R] | Rep. Paul Gilbert [D] | Rep. Donald Pilon [D] |
Rep. Michael Shaw [D] | Rep. Meredith Strang Burgess [R] | Rep. Peter Stuckey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2010-04-07 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 417 27 Yeas - 8 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent | |
2010-03-16 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence | |
2010-03-11 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-11 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-03-09 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-672) in concurrence | |
2010-03-09 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-09 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2010-03-04 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2010-03-04 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-672) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2010-03-04 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2010-03-04 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-04 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-672) | |
2010-03-04 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2010-03-02 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-12-23 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. | |
2009-12-23 | (H) Received by the Clerk of the House on December 21, 2009. |