ME LD1641 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend the Marijuana Legalization Act Regarding Retail Marijuana Testing Facilities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend the Marijuana Legalization Act Regarding Retail Marijuana Testing Facilities

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2017-08-02 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #435 (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-08-02 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #450 (Y: 131 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-07-20 - House - Enactment - Emer RC #432 (Y: 101 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-02Senatein concurrence
2017-08-02SenateLD 1641 In Senate, August 2, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 31 IN FAVOR and 1 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
2017-08-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-08-02HouseROLL CALL NO. 450V 131 having voted in the affirmative and 6 in the negative, with 13 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
2017-08-02HouseThis Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
2017-07-20SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2017-07-20HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-07-20HouseROLL CALL NO. 432 (Yeas 101 - Nays 32 - Absent 17 - Excused 1)
2017-07-20HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-07-20HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2017-07-20HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-07-20HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-326).
2017-07-20SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-07-20SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-326) In NON-CONCURRENCE
2017-07-20SenateOn further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-326) READ and ADOPTED
2017-07-20SenateOn motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED
2017-07-20SenateOn Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2017-06-27SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2017-06-23HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-23HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-06-23HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House being necessary, a total was taken.
2017-06-23HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2017-06-22HouseUnfinished Business
2017-06-22HouseLater today assigned.
2017-06-22HouseOn motion of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
2017-06-21HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-21HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
2017-06-21HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2017-06-21HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2017-06-21HouseReport was READ and ACCEPTED.
2017-06-21HouseReported by Representative PIERCE for the Joint Select Committee on Marijuana Legalization Implementation pursuant to Joint Order 2017, H.P. 96.
2017-06-21SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence
2017-06-21SenateREAD ONCE
2017-06-21SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback