ME LD1634 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Update the Scheduling Guidelines for Review of Agencies or Independent Agencies under the State Government Evaluation Act
Title
An Act To Update the Scheduling Guidelines for Review of Agencies or Independent Agencies under the State Government Evaluation Act
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence |
2017-06-08 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2017-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2017-06-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-07 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-07 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-07 | House | Reported by Representative BERRY for the Joint Standing Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology pursuant to Joint Order 2017, H.P. 1116. |