ME LD163 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Revise Maine's Environmental Laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Revise Maine's Environmental Laws

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2021-06-15HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-15HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2021-06-15SenateOn motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-441) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-221) AND House Amendment "A" (H-582) thereto in concurrence
2021-06-14HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-14HouseIn NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
2021-06-14HouseSubsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-441) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-221) and House Amendment "A" (H-582) thereto.
2021-06-14HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-441) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-582) thereto was ADOPTED.
2021-06-14HouseOn further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-582) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-441) was READ and ADOPTED.
2021-06-14HouseOn further motion of the same Representative, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-441).
2021-06-14HouseOn motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-441).
2021-06-14HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2021-06-10HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-10HouseLater today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered)
2021-06-10HouseOn motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
2021-06-10HouseRepresentative DILLINGHAM of Oxford REQUESTED a Roll Call. More than one-fifth of the members present expressed a desire for a roll call, which was ORDERED.
2021-06-10HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2021-06-10HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-10HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-441) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-221) thereto.
2021-06-09SenateSent down for concurrence
2021-06-09SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-441) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-221) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2021-06-09SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-441) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-221) thereto ADOPTED
2021-06-09SenateOn motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland Senate Amendment "A" (S-221) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-441) READ and ADOPTED
2021-06-09SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-441) READ
2021-06-09SenateREAD ONCE
2021-06-09SenateOn motion by Senator BRENNER of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
2021-06-09SenateReports Read
2021-06-08HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-08HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-441).
2021-06-08HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2021-06-08HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-441) was READ and ADOPTED.
2021-06-08HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2021-06-08HouseOn motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2021-06-08HouseReports READ.
2021-06-07JointReported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
2021-05-24JointVoted: Divided Report
2021-05-24JointWork Session Held
2021-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-01-19HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2021-01-19HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on January 19, 2021.

Subjects


Maine State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=163&snum=130
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0119&item=1&snum=130
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0119&item=7&snum=130
Amendmenthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0119&item=2&snum=130
Amendmenthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0119&item=3&snum=130
Amendmenthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0119&item=6&snum=130
Supplementhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN016302.pdf
Supplementhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN016303.pdf
Supplementhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN016306.pdf
Supplementhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN016307.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback