ME LD1624 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Implement Ranked-choice Voting
Title
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Implement Ranked-choice Voting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-23 - House - Final Passage - Con Res RC #384 (Y: 78 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'b' Ontp RC #366 (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'b' Ontp RC #366 (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Subsequently FAILED FINAL PASSAGE in concurrence |
2017-07-20 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - 2/3 Present Required In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-23 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 384 (Yeas 78 - Nays 68 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2017-06-23 | House | This being a Constitutional Amendment, a two-thirds vote of the membership of the House present being necessary, a total was taken. |
2017-06-23 | House | FAILED FINAL PASSAGE. |
2017-06-22 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-22 | House | The RESOLUTION was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-300). |
2017-06-22 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the RESOLUTION was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-22 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-300) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-22 | House | The RESOLUTION was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-22 | House | On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-22 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-300) READ and ADOPTED Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-300) |
2017-06-21 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Report A Ought to Pass As Amended ACCEPTED READ ONCE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Senator MASON of Androscoggin asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw his motion to ACCEPT Report C Ought To Pass As Amended. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin to ACCEPT Report C Ought to Pass As Amended |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Senator MASON of Androscoggin moved to to ACCEPT The Report C Ought to Pass As Amended |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 366 Yeas 17 - Nays 17 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin to ACCEPT Report B Ought Not To Pass FAILED |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-05-31 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-31 | House | The RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |