ME LD1623 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Make a Needed Clarification to the Term "Heroin" as Used in the Maine Criminal Code
Title
An Act To Make a Needed Clarification to the Term "Heroin" as Used in the Maine Criminal Code
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-16 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2017-06-16 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-16 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Senator ROSEN of Hancock asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not To Pass Report. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-13 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report, |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Senator ROSEN of Hancock moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-05-31 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-31 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1623&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0576&item=1&snum=128 |