ME LD162 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Enrolled on March 12 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Provide Equity in the State Income Tax Deduction for Certain Public Employees Retirement System Pensions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Provide Equity in the State Income Tax Deduction for Certain Public Employees Retirement System Pensions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
2020-03-17SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2020-03-17HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
2020-03-17HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2020-03-17HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2020-03-12HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2020-03-12HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-418).
2020-03-12HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2020-03-12HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2020-03-10SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2020-03-10SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-418).
2020-03-10SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-418) READ and ADOPTED.
2020-03-10SenateREAD ONCE.
2020-03-10SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20HouseCarried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-01-17HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-01-17HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION.
2019-01-17SenateCommittee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TAXATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback