ME LD1602 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Establishing the Working Group on Mental Health
Title
Resolve, Establishing the Working Group on Mental Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-19 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-06-19 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2019-06-18 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-18 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-213) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-310) thereto. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-213) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-310) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-213) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-310) thereto ADOPTED |
2019-06-18 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-310) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-213) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-213) was ADOPTED |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-213) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE |
2019-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2019-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-07 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-06-07 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2019-06-06 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-06 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-213). |
2019-06-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-06 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-213). |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-213) READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-04-18 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-18 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |