ME LD1594 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Dispensing of Naloxone Hydrochloride by Pharmacists
Title
An Act Regarding the Dispensing of Naloxone Hydrochloride by Pharmacists
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Vachon [R] | Sen. Garrett Mason [R] | Sen. James Dill [D] | Rep. David Woodsome [R] |
Rep. Paul Chace [R] | Rep. Sara Gideon [D] | Rep. Frances Head [R] | Rep. Patricia Hymanson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #257 (Y: 126 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2017-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-09 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-355) in concurrence |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-355) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-08 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-355). |
2017-06-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-07 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-355) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-07 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-07 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 257 (Yeas 126 - Nays 20 - Absent 4 - Excused 1) |
2017-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-07 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-01 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-01 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-06-01 | House | On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2017-06-01 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator Volk of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development, in concurrence. |
2017-05-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |
2017-05-11 | House | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed. |