ME LD1594 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Review and Make Recommendations on Challenges, Gaps and Inefficiencies in Maine's Emergency Crisis Hotline and "Warm Line" Services
Title
Resolve, To Review and Make Recommendations on Challenges, Gaps and Inefficiencies in Maine's Emergency Crisis Hotline and "Warm Line" Services
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Dorney [D] | Rep. Margaret Craven [D] | Sen. Stanley Gerzofsky [D] | Sen. Anne Haskell [D] |
Rep. Roberta Beavers [D] | Rep. Richard Malaby [R] | Rep. Timothy Marks [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-14 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #705 (Y: 92 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2014-03-31 - House - Final Passage RC #596 (Y: 83 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #499 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - Adopt Hah-745 To Cah-683 RC #571 (Y: 87 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #538 (Y: 89 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - Final Passage RC #596 (Y: 83 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #499 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - Adopt Hah-745 To Cah-683 RC #571 (Y: 87 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #538 (Y: 89 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2014-04-14 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 705V 92 having voted in the affirmative and 53 in the negative, with 6 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2014-04-14 | House | This Resolve, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2014-03-31 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2014-03-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-31 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 596 (Yeas 83 - Nays 50 - Absent 18 - Excused 0) |
2014-03-31 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 499 20 Yeas - 14 Nays- 0 Excused - 1 Absent PREVAILED |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Subsequently, The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-683) As Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-745) thereto , in concurrence. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending On motion by Same Senator to RECEDE and CONCUR to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-683) As Amended By House Amendment "A" (H-745) thereto , in concurrence. |
2014-03-26 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-26 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2014-03-26 | House | Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-683) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-745) thereto |
2014-03-26 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-683) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-745) thereto ADOPTED. |
2014-03-26 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 571 (Yeas 87 - Nays 53 - Absent 11 - Excused 0) |
2014-03-26 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, House Amendment "A" (H-745) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-683) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-03-26 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, under FURTHER suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-683). |
2014-03-26 | House | On motion of Representative DORNEY of Norridgewock, under suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-683). |
2014-03-26 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2014-03-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-24 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-24 | House | Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2014-03-24 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, TABLED pending FINAL PASSAGE. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-683), in concurrence. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-683) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator CRAVEN of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2014-03-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-19 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-683). |
2014-03-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2014-03-19 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-683) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-03-19 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2014-03-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 538 (Yeas 89 - Nays 52 - Absent 10 - Excused 0) |
2014-03-19 | House | On motion of Representative FARNSWORTH of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-19 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-12-30 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2013-12-30 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 23, 2013. |