ME LD1593 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Animal Welfare Laws To Add Provisions Relating to the Surrender of Animals
Title
An Act To Amend the Animal Welfare Laws To Add Provisions Relating to the Surrender of Animals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - House - Acc Min Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #275 (Y: 80 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-446) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-12 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-12 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-446) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-446) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-09 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-08 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 275 (Yeas 80 - Nays 64 - Absent 6 - Excused 1) |
2017-06-08 | House | On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-08 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence |
2017-05-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2017-05-11 | House | Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed. |