ME LD1591 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry To Identify Places with Offensive Names and Methods of Changing Those Names
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry To Identify Places with Offensive Names and Methods of Changing Those Names
Sponsors
Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] | Rep. Richard Evans [D] | Sen. Craig Hickman [D] | Sen. Chloe Maxmin [D] |
Rep. David McCrea [D] | Rep. Genevieve McDonald [D] | Rep. Margaret O'Neil [D] | Rep. William Pluecker [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-18 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-719) in concurrence |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-719) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-17 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-719). |
2021-06-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-17 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-719) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-17 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-16 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |