ME LD1590 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Authorizing the Aroostook Band of Micmacs and the Houlton Band of Maliseet Indians To Benefit from the Operation of an Existing Casino
Title
An Act Authorizing the Aroostook Band of Micmacs and the Houlton Band of Maliseet Indians To Benefit from the Operation of an Existing Casino
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Carpenter [D] | Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] | Rep. Benjamin Collings [D] | Rep. Sheldon Hanington [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #515 (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2018-03-01 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-01 | House | On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reports READ. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 515 Yeas 17 - Nays 14 - Excused 4 - Absent 0 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-08-02 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-05-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-11 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-05-11 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-05-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-09 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-05-09 | House | On motion of Representative BEAR of the Houlton Band of Maliseet Indians, TABLED pending REFERENCE in concurrence. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |