ME LD1590 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on February 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend the Operating-under-the-influence Laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend the Operating-under-the-influence Laws

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-27SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2014-02-27HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2014-02-27HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2014-02-25SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2014-02-25SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-614), in concurrence.
2014-02-25SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-614) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2014-02-25SenateREAD ONCE.
2014-02-25SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2014-02-20HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2014-02-20HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-614)
2014-02-20HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2014-02-20HouseUnder suspension of the rules
2014-02-20HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2013-12-30HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2013-12-30HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on December 23, 2013.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback