ME LD1586 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Appropriate Funds To Provide Sea Protection and Public Access to the Historic Whaleback Lighthouse in Kittery
Title
An Act To Appropriate Funds To Provide Sea Protection and Public Access to the Historic Whaleback Lighthouse in Kittery
Sponsors
Rep. Deane Rykerson [D] | Sen. Dawn Hill [D] | Sen. Pinny Beebe-Center [D] | Rep. Lydia Blume [D] |
Sen. Mark Lawrence [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #497 (Y: 80 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of Majority OUGHT NOT TO PASS Report In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-03-15 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-15 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-614). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2018-03-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Reports Read |
2018-03-01 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-01 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-614). |
2018-03-01 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-614) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-03-01 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2018-03-01 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 497 (Yeas 80 - Nays 64 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2018-03-01 | House | On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-08-02 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-05-16 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-16 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-05-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2017-05-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-05-09 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |