ME LD1578 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Update Maine's Solid Waste Management Laws
Title
An Act To Update Maine's Solid Waste Management Laws
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Saviello [R] | Rep. Richard Campbell [R] | Sen. Catherine Breen [D] | Rep. Robert Duchesne [D] |
Rep. Joan Welsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2016-04-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-31 | Senate | On motion by Senator SAVIELLO of Franklin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Report READ |
2016-02-02 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-02-02 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator Saviello of Franklin REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES |
2016-01-28 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1578&snum=127 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0626&item=1&snum=127 |