ME LD1574 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Maine Voters from Intimidating Video Recording at the Polls
Title
An Act To Protect Maine Voters from Intimidating Video Recording at the Polls
Sponsors
Sen. William Diamond [D] | Rep. Arthur Verow [D] | Sen. Stanley Gerzofsky [D] | Sen. Kimberley Rosen [R] |
Sen. Linda Valentino [D] | Rep. Brian Hobart [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-29 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-03-28 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-28 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-366) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-431) thereto |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-366) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-431) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-366) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-431) thereto ADOPTED |
2016-03-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland Senate Amendment "A" (S-431) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-366) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator the Senate RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-366) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator the Senate RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-366) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland the Senate RECONSIDERED ENACTMENT |
2016-03-24 | Senate | RECALLED From Governor's Desk pursuant to Joint Order SP 683. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-03-08 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-08 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-366). |
2016-03-08 | House | READ the Second Time. |
2016-03-08 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2016-03-03 | House | TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-366) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2016-03-03 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2016-03-03 | House | On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2016-03-03 | House | Reports READ. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-366). |
2016-03-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-366) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-02-25 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2016-02-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reports READ |
2016-01-26 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-01-26 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator Cyrway of Kennebec REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS |
2016-01-26 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS |