ME LD1570 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-18 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-18 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing the We Support Our Troops Registration Plates
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing the We Support Our Troops Registration Plates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-18 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2010-02-17 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-02-17 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-02-11 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-606) in concurrence | |
2010-02-11 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-606) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2010-02-09 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2010-02-09 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-02-09 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-606) | |
2010-02-09 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2010-02-09 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2010-02-04 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-12-21 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. | |
2009-12-21 | (H) Received by the Clerk of the House on December 17, 2009. |