ME LD1568 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-02 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-02 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Clarify Maine's Phaseout of Polybrominated Diphenyl Ethers
Title
An Act To Clarify Maine's Phaseout of Polybrominated Diphenyl Ethers
Sponsors
Sen. Emily Cain [D] | Rep. Robert Duchesne [D] | Rep. Jane Eberle [D] | Rep. Mark Eves [D] |
Sen. Seth Goodall [D] | Rep. Jon Hinck [D] | Rep. Melissa Innes [D] | Rep. Jane Knapp [R] |
Rep. John Martin [D] | Rep. W. Mitchell [D] | Rep. Hannah Pingree [D] | Rep. Joan Welsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-02 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2010-04-02 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-04-02 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-03-31 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-31 | (H) The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-731) as Amended by Senate Amendment "C" (S-502) thereto. | |
2010-03-31 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2010-03-31 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-731) as Amended by Senate Amendment "C" (S-502) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-03-31 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-731) as Amended by Senate Amendment "C" (S-502) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-03-31 | (S) On motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc Senate Amendment "C" (S-502) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-731) READ and ADOPTED (Remarks Made) Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 392 34 Yeas - 0 Nays- 0 Excused - 1 Absent | |
2010-03-31 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-731) READ | |
2010-03-31 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2010-03-31 | (S) Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-731) Report ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2010-03-31 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2010-03-30 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-29 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-26 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-25 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-24 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-23 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-22 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-22 | (S) On motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report in concurrence | |
2010-03-22 | (S) Report READ | |
2010-03-18 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-731) | |
2010-03-18 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2010-03-17 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-12-21 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on NATURAL RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. | |
2009-12-21 | (H) Received by the Clerk of the House on December 17, 2009. |