ME LD1566 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Determine Ways To Increase the Number of Recipients under the Tuition Waiver Program for Participants in Foster Care
Title
Resolve, To Determine Ways To Increase the Number of Recipients under the Tuition Waiver Program for Participants in Foster Care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #129 (Y: 89 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #126 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #126 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-29 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-05-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-138). |
2019-05-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-05-28 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-138) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-28 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-05-28 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 129 (Yeas 89 - Nays 49 - Absent 10 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-05-28 | House | On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-28 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-138) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-138) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-05-23 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 126 Yeas 35 - Nays 0 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-04-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |