ME LD1566 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Concerning the Establishment of Water Levels
Title
An Act Concerning the Establishment of Water Levels
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2016-01-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-01-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES |
2016-01-28 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-01-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin Report Accepted REFERENCE to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-01-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the report. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Report READ |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Reported by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin for the Joint Standing Committee on Environment and Natural Resources pursuant to Public Law 2015, chapter 264, section 5 |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1566&snum=127 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0618&item=1&snum=127 |