ME LD1557 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Raise the Speed Limit on Interstate 95 between the City of Old Town and the Town of Houlton
Title
An Act To Raise the Speed Limit on Interstate 95 between the City of Old Town and the Town of Houlton
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2011-06-03 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT | |
2011-06-03 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-03 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-06-02 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-447) in concurrence | |
2011-06-02 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules | |
2011-06-02 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (H-447) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2011-06-01 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-01 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-447) | |
2011-06-01 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-06-01 | (H) Under suspension of the rules | |
2011-06-01 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-05-10 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Collins of York, REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-05-10 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-10 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. | |
2011-05-10 | (H) Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |