ME LD1551 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ban the Sale of Cosmetics That Have Been Tested on Animals
Title
An Act To Ban the Sale of Cosmetics That Have Been Tested on Animals
Sponsors
Rep. Victoria Doudera [D] | Sen. Stacy Brenner [D] | Sen. Anne Carney [D] | Sen. Nicole Grohoski [D] |
Rep. Allison Hepler [D] | Rep. Michele Meyer [D] | Rep. Beth O'Connor [R] | Rep. Sarah Pebworth [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-03 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-05-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-05-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-05-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-05-19 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2021-05-19 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-05-06 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2021-05-06 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-20 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-04-20 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on April 20, 2021. |