ME LD1546 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Make Allocations from Maine Turnpike Authority Funds for the Maine Turnpike Authority for the Calendar Year Ending December 31, 2017
Title
An Act To Make Allocations from Maine Turnpike Authority Funds for the Maine Turnpike Authority for the Calendar Year Ending December 31, 2017
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-01 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-01 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-518), in concurrence. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-518) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2016-02-23 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2016-02-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-02-18 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-518). |
2016-02-18 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2016-02-18 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2016-02-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2016-01-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator Collins of York REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2016-01-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-01-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2016-01-12 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2016-01-12 | House | Representative McLEAN for the Maine Turnpike Authority pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 23, section 1961, subsection 6, reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |