ME LD1532 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Clarify Financial Responsibility in Gestational Carrier Agreements
Title
An Act To Clarify Financial Responsibility in Gestational Carrier Agreements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #594 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #649 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #649 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-12 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 594V 148 having voted in the affirmative and 0 in the negative, with 3 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2016-04-12 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2016-04-11 | Senate | LD 1532 In Senate, April 11, 2016, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 33 in Favor and 2 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2016-03-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-29 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-03-29 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2016-03-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-427). |
2016-03-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2016-03-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2016-03-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-427) . |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-427) READ and ADOPTED. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2016-01-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-01-07 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2016-01-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator Burns of Washington REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Committee on JUDICIARY |