ME LD1532 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Commissioner of Marine Resources To Contract for an Independent Analysis of the Limited Entry Lobster License System
Title
Resolve, Directing the Commissioner of Marine Resources To Contract for an Independent Analysis of the Limited Entry Lobster License System
Sponsors
Sen. Jonathan Courtney [R] | Sen. Dana Dow [R] | Rep. Jonathan Mckane [R] | Rep. James Parker [R] |
Rep. Dianne Tilton [R] | Sen. Linda Valentino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED in concurrence | |
2011-05-26 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-26 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2011-05-23 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-278) in concurrence | |
2011-05-23 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-19 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2011-05-19 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (H-278) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-278) | |
2011-05-19 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Snowe-Mello of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Committee on Marine Resources suggested and ordered printed. |