ME LD1531 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Victims of Human Trafficking
Title
An Act To Protect Victims of Human Trafficking
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Volk [R] | Rep. Barry Hobbins [D] | Sen. David C. Burns [R] | Sen. Brian Langley [R] |
Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] | Rep. Charlotte Warren [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2016-04-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-04-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-457). |
2016-04-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2016-04-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2016-04-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-457) . |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-457) READ and ADOPTED. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2016-01-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-01-07 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2016-01-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator Burns of Washington REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Committee on JUDICIARY |