ME LD1517 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve, To Ensure Access to Behavioral Health Services

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve, To Ensure Access to Behavioral Health Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-19 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #331 (Y: 9 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
2017-08-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601.
2017-06-19SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
2017-06-19HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-19HouseFINALLY PASSED.
2017-06-19SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-491) in concurrence
2017-06-19SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-491) READ and ADOPTED
2017-06-19SenateREAD ONCE
2017-06-19SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
2017-06-19SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 331 Yeas 9 - Nays 26 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2017-06-19SenateMotion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report . FAILED
2017-06-19SenateReports Read
2017-06-16HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-16HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-491).
2017-06-16HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2017-06-16HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-491) was READ and ADOPTED.
2017-06-16HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2017-06-16HouseOn motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2017-06-16HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2017-06-15HouseUnfinished Business
2017-06-14HouseUnfinished Business
2017-06-14HouseLater today assigned.
2017-06-14HouseOn motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
2017-06-14HouseReports READ.
2017-04-25SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence
2017-04-25HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-04-25HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
2017-04-25HouseCommittee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback